EP0061213 - Device for displaying digital information incorporating selection of picture pages and/or resolution enhancement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.1986 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.12.1986 [1986/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1982/39] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmitz, Herman Jan Renier c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1982/39] | Representative(s) | Strijland, Wilfred, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1982/39] | Strijland, Wilfred, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 82200241.6 | 26.02.1982 | [1982/39] | Priority number, date | NL19810001339 | 19.03.1981 Original published format: NL 8101339 | [1982/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0061213 | Date: | 29.09.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0061213 | Date: | 18.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G09G1/28 | [1982/39] | CPC: |
G09G5/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1982/39] | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Darstellung digitaler Daten, einschliesslich der Auswahl von Bildseiten und/oder der Verbesserung des Auflösungsvermögens | [1982/39] | English: | Device for displaying digital information incorporating selection of picture pages and/or resolution enhancement | [1982/39] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage de données numériques, incorporant la sélection de pages d'image et/ou l'augmentation de la résolution | [1982/39] | Examination procedure | 26.02.1982 | Examination requested [1982/39] | 09.01.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 14.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2411446 (IBM [US]); | [AD]GB2032740 (TEKTRONIX INC) | Examination | - ISA TRANSACTIONS, vol.19, no.2, 1980, Pittsburgh (US) D.M. DARSEY: "Color graphic controls for the solar central receiver test facility", pages 65-74 |