EP0062944 - Apparatsu for producing fresh water from sea water by means of reverse osmosis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.1986 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.1986 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.11.1986 [1986/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lopez, Fernand 27, Rue Emile Barrière F-31200 Toulouse / FR | [1982/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1982/42] | Representative(s) | Barre, Philippe, et al Cabinet Barre-Gatti-Laforgue 95 rue des Amidonniers 31069 Toulouse Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/42] | Barre, Philippe, et al Cabinet Barre-Gatti-Laforgue 95 rue des Amidonniers F-31069 Toulouse Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 82200376.0 | 26.03.1982 | [1982/42] | Priority number, date | FR19810007185 | 06.04.1981 Original published format: FR 8107185 | [1982/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0062944 | Date: | 20.10.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0062944 | Date: | 19.06.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B01D13/00, C02F1/18 | [1982/42] | CPC: |
C02F1/441 (EP,US);
B01D61/08 (EP,US);
B01D63/024 (EP);
B01D63/0241 (US);
C02F1/002 (EP,US);
B01D2311/14 (EP,US);
B01D2313/06 (EP,US);
B01D2313/18 (EP,US);
B01D2313/20 (EP);
B01D2313/2011 (US);
B01D2313/24 (EP,US);
B01D2315/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/42] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung von Süsswasser aus Meereswasser mittels Umkehrosmose | [1982/42] | English: | Apparatsu for producing fresh water from sea water by means of reverse osmosis | [1982/42] | French: | Dispositif de production d'eau douce à partir d'eau de mer par osmose inverse | [1982/42] | Examination procedure | 05.04.1983 | Examination requested [1983/25] | 13.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.11.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.06.1985 | [1986/45] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1474929 (RECH S TECH ET IND S R T I S A); | [A]GB1141138 (ARTHUR PAUL PEDRICK); | [A]GB1436111 (SECR DEFENCE) |