EP0068569 - Digital data apparatus with memory identification [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.03.1990 [1990/12] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | For:DE
FR
IT
SE
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1983/43] | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | ||
For:DE
FR
IT
SE
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1983/01] | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONIC AND ASSOCIATED INDUSTRIES LIMITED Arundel Great Court 8 Arundel Street London WC2R 3DT / GB | ||
For:DE
FR
IT
SE
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kinghorn, John Ritchie c/o Mullard Limited New Road Mitcham Surrey CR4 4XY / GB | [1983/01] | Representative(s) | Boxall, Robin John, et al Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/01] | Boxall, Robin John, et al Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 82200754.8 | 18.06.1982 | [1983/01] | Priority number, date | GB19810019756 | 26.06.1981 Original published format: GB 8119756 | [1983/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0068569 | Date: | 05.01.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0068569 | Date: | 15.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0068569 | Date: | 05.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/00 | [1989/14] | CPC: |
G06F12/0684 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/49] | G06F13/00, G06F11/00 | ||
Former IPC [1983/01] | G06F13/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1983/01] | Title | German: | Digitaldatengerät mit Speicheridentifizierung | [1983/01] | English: | Digital data apparatus with memory identification | [1983/01] | French: | Appareil de données numériques avec identification de mémoire | [1983/01] | Examination procedure | 18.06.1982 | Examination requested [1983/01] | 04.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.07.1988 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   13.07.1988 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 05.04.1989 | [1989/36] | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2212958 (HONEYWELL INF SYSTEMS [US]); | [A]US4041460 (WISDOM GRAHAM JOHN, et al); | [A]GB2005880 (BUNKER RAMO); | [YD]EP0028312 (IBM [US]) | [Y] - EDN MAGAZINE, vol. 26, no. 3, February 1981, page 88, Boston, MA, US; N.D. MACKINTOSH: "Interrogation tells muP which boards are present" |