EP0072053 - Basic sediment and water measurement in crude oil streams [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.1987 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.1987 [1987/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1983/07] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stewart, Thomas Lee 5211 Warm Springs Road Houston Texas 77035 / US | [1983/07] | Representative(s) | Aalbers, Onno, et al P.O. Box 162 2501 AN Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/02] | Aalbers, Onno, et al P.O. Box 162 NL-2501 AN The Hague / NL | ||
Former [1983/07] | Puister, Antonius Tonnis, Mr. P.O. Box 302 NL-2501 CH The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 82200857.9 | 08.07.1982 | [1983/07] | Priority number, date | US19810291599 | 10.08.1981 Original published format: US 291599 | [1983/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0072053 | Date: | 16.02.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0072053 | Date: | 20.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0072053 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/28, G01N27/22 | [1983/07] | CPC: |
G01N33/2823 (EP,US);
G01N27/226 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/07] | Title | German: | Messung des Wasser- und basischen Sedimentengehaltes in Ölen | [1983/07] | English: | Basic sediment and water measurement in crude oil streams | [1983/07] | French: | Mesure de la teneur en eau et sédiments basiques de pétroles bruts | [1983/07] | Examination procedure | 08.07.1982 | Examination requested [1983/07] | 27.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4184952 (STEWART THOMAS L [US]); | [A]US3546926 (DUNAVENT SIDNEY WILLIAM JR, et al); | [A]US3189180 (SCOTT PAUL R, et al); | [A]FR2193929 (CMELIK RUDOLF [VE]); | [A]FR1427818 (SCHLUMBERGER PROSPECTION) |