EP0072068 - Promotional can end [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.1986 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. 9300 Ashton Road P.O. Box 6208 Philadelphia, Pa. 19131 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/07] | For all designated states Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. 9300 Ashton Road P.O. Box 6208 Philadelphia, Pa. 19131 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ruemer, John, Jr. 2918 Dunmurry Road Baltimore Maryland 21222 / US | 02 /
Potts, Vinson S. Cunningham Lane Cherry Hill New Jersey 08034 / US | [1983/07] | Representative(s) | Urbanus, Henricus Maria, et al c/o Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 107 2587 BP 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1983/07] | Urbanus, Henricus Maria, Ir., et al c/o Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 107 NL-2587 BP 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 82200957.7 | 26.07.1982 | [1983/07] | Priority number, date | US19810286866 | 27.07.1981 Original published format: US 286866 | [1983/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0072068 | Date: | 16.02.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B65D17/32, G09F23/00 | [1983/07] | CPC: |
G09F19/00 (EP,US);
B65D17/4012 (EP,US);
B65D2517/0014 (EP,US);
B65D2517/0053 (EP,US);
B65D2517/0062 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, NL [1983/07] | Title | German: | Dosenverschluss mit verkaufsfördernder Ausgestaltung | [1983/07] | English: | Promotional can end | [1983/07] | French: | Couvercle de boîte conçu pour aider à la vente | [1983/07] | File destroyed: | 03.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 14.04.1983 | Examination requested [1983/26] | 28.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1986/19] | 30.12.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3233770 [ ] (WATERS JOSEPH J); | US3547746 [ ] (GWINNER WALTER C); | US3581690 [ ] (ZAPATA G CLAUDIO); | US4184607 [ ] (POTTS VINSON S [US]); | DE2756571 [ ]; | FR2474453 [ ] (MARIOTTI ANDRE [FR]) |