EP0075351 - Method of making an identity card, and identity card produced, for example, by means of this method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.10.1989 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
RTC-COMPELEC 130, Avenue Ledru-Rollin F-75011 Paris / FR | For:CH
DE
GB
IT
LI
SE
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/40] | For:FR
RTC-COMPELEC 130, Avenue Ledru-Rollin F-75011 Paris / FR | ||
For:CH
DE
GB
IT
LI
SE
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1983/13] | For:FR
R.T.C. LA RADIOTECHNIQUE-COMPELEC Société anonyme dite: 51 rue Carnot BP 301 F-92156 Suresnes Cédex / FR | ||
For:CH
DE
GB
IT
LI
SE
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parmentier, Paul Société Civile S.P.I.D. 209 rue de l'Université F-75007 Paris / FR | [1983/13] | Representative(s) | Pinchon, Pierre, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | [1983/13] | Application number, filing date | 82201102.9 | 07.09.1982 | [1983/13] | Priority number, date | FR19810017231 | 11.09.1981 Original published format: FR 8117231 | [1983/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0075351 | Date: | 30.03.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/06, H01L23/54 | [1983/13] | CPC: |
H01L23/5388 (EP,US);
G06K19/07745 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48465 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1983/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Fabrikation einer Identitätskarte und Identitätskarte, die beispielsweise nach diesem Verfahren hergestellt wird | [1983/13] | English: | Method of making an identity card, and identity card produced, for example, by means of this method | [1983/13] | French: | Procédé pour fabriquer une carte d'identification et carte d'identification produite, par exemple au moyen de ce procédé | [1983/13] | Examination procedure | 07.09.1982 | Examination requested [1983/13] | 30.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1989/49] | 18.09.1989 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1989/49] | Appeal following examination | 01.03.1986 | Appeal received No. T0172/86 | 23.05.1986 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.03.1988 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M06) [1988/13] | 22.09.1988 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1988/39] | 10.06.1989 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 01.06.1989 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.09.1989 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2026234 (MITSUMI ELECTRIC CO); | [Y]FR2191406 (IBM [US]); | [Y]FR2439438 (CII HONEYWELL BULL) |