EP0078081 - Vertical synchronizing information generating device in a video tape recorder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.1985 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.1985 [1985/39] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | For:FR
GB
AT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1983/18] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
AT
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kröner, Klaus Immenhorstweg 94 D-2000 Hamburg 65 / DE | [1983/18] | Representative(s) | Poddig, Dieter, et al Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH, Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/18] | Poddig, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 82201307.4 | 21.10.1982 | [1983/18] | Priority number, date | DE19813142272 | 24.10.1981 Original published format: DE 3142272 | [1983/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0078081 | Date: | 04.05.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0078081 | Date: | 29.08.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/93, H04N5/06 | [1983/18] | CPC: |
H04N5/932 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [1983/18] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zur Erzeugung der Vertikal-Synchronisierinformation in einem Video-Magnetbandgerät | [1983/18] | English: | Vertical synchronizing information generating device in a video tape recorder | [1983/18] | French: | Générateur d'information de synchronisation verticale dans un magnétoscope | [1983/18] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 21.10.1982 | Examination requested [1983/18] | 18.11.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.01.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1202316 [ ] (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO); | DE1923111 [ ]; | DE1914008 [ ]; | US4203138 [ ] (ELENBAAS WILLIAM J [US]) |