EP0078573 - Colour display tube [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.1988 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.03.1988 [1988/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1983/19] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thompson-Russell, Kathryn Carney c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1983/19] | Representative(s) | Koppen, Jan, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/47] | Koppen, Jan, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1983/19] | van der Goot, Dirk Pieter Johannes INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 82201343.9 | 28.10.1982 | [1983/19] | Priority number, date | NL19810004894 | 29.10.1981 Original published format: NL 8104894 | [1983/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0078573 | Date: | 11.05.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0078573 | Date: | 18.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H01J29/07 | [1983/19] | CPC: |
H01J29/07 (EP,KR,US);
H01J2229/0772 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1983/19] | Title | German: | Farbbildröhre | [1983/19] | English: | Colour display tube | [1983/19] | French: | Tube-image en couleurs | [1983/19] | Examination procedure | 28.10.1982 | Examination requested [1983/19] | 27.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.09.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/10] | Request for further processing for: | 23.12.1983 | Request for further processing filed | 23.12.1983 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.01.1984 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5257776 ; | JP5257776 [ ]; | [A]FR2443135 (RCA CORP [US]); | [A]FR2151051 (HITACHI LTD); | [AD]US3809945 (ROEDER N); | [A]US4191909 (DOUGHERTY LAWRENCE W [US]); | [A]US4056755 (SOHN FRANK MYUNG-HI) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 1, no. 124, 18th October 1977, page 5302 E77; & JP - A - 52 57 776 (MATSUSHITA DENSHI SANGYO K.K.) (12-05-1977), & JP5257776 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 1, no. 124, 18th October 1977, page 5302 E77; & JP - A - 52 57 776 (MATSUSHITA DENSHI SANGYO K.K.) (12-05-1977), & JP5257776 A 00000000 |