EP0081869 - A non-woven tube for membrane filtration and method of forming same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/25] | A non-woven tube for membrane filtration and method of forming the same | ||
[1987/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STORK FRIESLAND B.V. Stationsweg 84 8401 DT Gorredijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1987/10] | For all designated states STORK FRIESLAND B.V. Stationsweg 84 NL-8401 DT Gorredijk / NL | ||
Former [1983/25] | For all designated states WAFILIN B.V. 251 Händellaan NL-8031 EM Zwolle / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van Zon, Cornelis 12 Dennenlaan NL-8024 BD Zwolle / NL | 02 /
Jonkeren, Gerrit Jan 4 Broekdijk NL-7698 TD Bruchterveld / NL | 03 /
Eggengoor, Hilbert 55 Broekdijk NL-7695 TC Bruchterveld / NL | [1983/25] | Representative(s) | van der Veken, Johannes Adriaan, et al Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1983/52] | van der Veken, Johannes Adriaan, et al van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 NL-2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | ||
Former [1983/25] | van der Veken, Johannes Adriaan, Ir. EXTERPATENT 3 & 4 Willem Witsenplein NL-2596 BK The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 82201494.0 | 25.11.1982 | [1983/25] | Priority number, date | NL19810005621 | 14.12.1981 Original published format: NL 8105621 | [1983/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0081869 | Date: | 22.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0081869 | Date: | 16.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/08, B29C53/04, B01D13/04 | [1987/25] | CPC: |
B01D69/1071 (EP,US);
B01D39/163 (EP,US);
B29C53/36 (EP,US);
B29C53/382 (EP,US);
B29C65/08 (EP,US);
B29C65/4815 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP);
B29C66/21 (EP,US);
B29C66/5221 (EP,US);
B29C66/52272 (EP,US);
B29C66/63 (EP,US);
B29C66/727 (EP,US);
B32B1/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/02 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/12 (EP,US);
B32B27/36 (EP,US);
B32B5/26 (EP,US);
B32B7/14 (EP,US);
D04H1/54 (EP,US);
D04H1/76 (EP,US);
B01D2239/10 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29K2001/12 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0854 (EP,US);
B29L2009/00 (EP,US);
B29L2023/22 (EP,US);
B29L2031/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2001/12 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2027/16 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2033/20 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2071/12 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2077/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2079/08 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [1983/25] | B29C27/00, B29D23/10, B01D13/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/25] | Title | German: | Faservliesröhre für die Membranfiltrierung und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1983/25] | English: | A non-woven tube for membrane filtration and method of forming same | [1987/25] | French: | Tube en matière non-tissée pour la filtration à membrane et son procédé de fabrication | [1987/25] |
Former [1983/25] | A non-woven tube for membrane filtration and method of forming the same | ||
Former [1983/25] | Tube matière non-tissée pour la filtration à membrane et son procédé de fabrication | Examination procedure | 03.03.1983 | Examination requested [1983/25] | 11.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.12.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.12.1984 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.12.1984 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.11.1987 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1256491 ; | [X]FR2276860 (WAFILIN BV [NL]); | [A]DE2629719 (KRUPP GMBH); | [A]FR2380129 (SIREIX GEORGES [FR], et al); | [A]US4214612 (DE PUTTER WARREN J [NL]); | [A]FR2477962 (SIREIX GEORGES [FR]) |