EP0080786 - Method for making thixotropic materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.1988 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.05.1988 [1988/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Dow Chemical Company 2020 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/23] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Abbott Road P.O. Box 1967 Midland Michigan 48640-1967 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Busk, Robert Scholley Harbour Town Yacht Basin P.O. Box 3163 Hilton Head Island, South Carolina 29928 / US | [1983/23] | Representative(s) | Urbanus, Henricus Maria, et al c/o Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 107 2587 BP 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1983/23] | Urbanus, Henricus Maria, Ir., et al c/o Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 107 NL-2587 BP 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 82201527.7 | 01.12.1982 | [1983/23] | Priority number, date | US19810326304 | 01.12.1981 Original published format: US 326304 | [1983/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0080786 | Date: | 08.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0080786 | Date: | 13.07.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0080786 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C22C1/00 | [1983/23] | CPC: |
B22C9/105 (EP,US);
C22C1/00 (KR);
C22C1/12 (EP,US);
B22D17/007 (EP,US);
Y10S164/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen einer metallischen Flüssig-Fest-Mischung | [1983/23] | English: | Method for making thixotropic materials | [1983/23] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de matériaux thixotropiques | [1983/23] | Examination procedure | 26.08.1983 | Examination requested [1983/45] | 25.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.10.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.11.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2266748 (PECHINEY ALUMINIUM [FR]); | [Y]FR2266749 (PECHINEY ALUMINIUM [FR]); | [Y]GB1543206 (SECRETARY INDUSTRY BRIT) | [Y] - NATIONAL TECHNICAL INFORMATION SERVICE, note NTN-79/0682, July 1979, report number AMMRC-CTR-75-22; |