EP0081877 - LH-RH antagonists [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.1987 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COY, David Howard 4319 Perrier Street New Orleans Louisiana 70115 / US | For all designated states Schally, Andrew Victor 5025 Kawanee Avenue Metairie Louisiana 70002 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/25] | For all designated states COY, David Howard 4319 Perrier Street New Orleans Louisiana 70115 / US | ||
For all designated states Schally, Andrew Victor 5025 Kawanee Avenue Metairie Louisiana 70002 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/25] | Representative(s) | Hermans, Frans G.M., et al Patent Department AKZO NOBEL N.V. Pharma Division P.O. Box 20 5340 BH Oss / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1983/25] | Hermans, Franciscus G.M., et al Patent Department AKZO NOBEL N.V. Pharma Division P.O. Box 20 NL-5340 BH Oss / NL | Application number, filing date | 82201544.2 | 06.12.1982 | [1983/25] | Priority number, date | US19810329526 | 10.12.1981 Original published format: US 329526 | US19820368702 | 15.04.1982 Original published format: US 368702 | [1983/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0081877 | Date: | 22.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0081877 | Date: | 30.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/06, C07K7/20, A61K37/02 | [1986/18] | CPC: |
C07K7/23 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1983/25] | C07C103/52, A61K37/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/25] | Title | German: | LH-RH-Antagonisten | [1983/25] | English: | LH-RH antagonists | [1983/25] | French: | Antagonistes de LH-RH | [1983/25] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 06.12.1983 | Examination requested [1984/07] | 06.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.10.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.04.1986 | BE | 30.04.1986 | CH | 30.04.1986 | FR | 30.04.1986 | IT | 30.04.1986 | LI | 30.04.1986 | NL | 30.04.1986 | SE | 30.04.1986 | LU | 31.12.1986 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 30.04.1986 | |
BE | 30.04.1986 | ||
CH | 30.04.1986 | ||
IT | 30.04.1986 | ||
LI | 30.04.1986 | ||
NL | 30.04.1986 | ||
SE | 30.04.1986 | ||
LU | 31.12.1986 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 30.04.1986 | |
BE | 30.04.1986 | ||
CH | 30.04.1986 | ||
IT | 30.04.1986 | ||
LI | 30.04.1986 | ||
NL | 30.04.1986 | ||
SE | 30.04.1986 | ||
Former [1989/21] | AT | 30.04.1986 | |
BE | 30.04.1986 | ||
CH | 30.04.1986 | ||
LI | 30.04.1986 | ||
NL | 30.04.1986 | ||
SE | 30.04.1986 | ||
Former [1989/15] | AT | 30.04.1986 | |
BE | 30.04.1986 | ||
NL | 30.04.1986 | ||
SE | 30.04.1986 | ||
Former [1988/31] | AT | 30.04.1986 | |
BE | 30.04.1986 | ||
NL | 30.04.1986 | ||
Former [1988/04] | AT | 30.04.1986 | |
BE | 30.04.1986 | ||
Former [1987/20] | AT | 30.04.1986 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0041286 | [A] - Chemical Abstracts vol. 94, no. 5, 2 February 1981, Columbus, Ohio, USA, D.H. COY et al. "LH-RH antagonists with potent antivulatory activity", abstract no. 25416u & Pept. Struct. Biol. Funct. Proc. Am. Pept. Symp.6th, 1979, pages 775-779 | Examination | US4317815 | - J. Med. Chem. 18/12 (1975), S. 1247 | - J. Med Chem. 21/3 (1978), S. 276 |