EP0056686 - Access control card [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.05.1989 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/30] | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis Minnesota 55408 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stamm, Thomas A. 7256 W. Thorndale Chicago Illinois 60631 / US | [1982/30] | Representative(s) | Frohwitter, Bernhard, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/52] | Frohwitter, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Postfach 86 06 20 D-81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/12] | Harman, Michael Godfrey Honeywell Control Systems Ltd. Patent Department Charles Square Bracknell Berkshire RG12 1EB / GB | ||
Former [1982/30] | Riddle, John Honeywell Control Systems Ltd. Patent Department Charles Square Bracknell, Berks. / GB | Application number, filing date | 82300063.3 | 07.01.1982 | [1982/30] | Priority number, date | US19810225087 | 14.01.1981 Original published format: US 225087 | [1982/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0056686 | Date: | 28.07.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0056686 | Date: | 11.08.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/06 | [1982/30] | CPC: |
G07C9/29 (EP,US);
G07C9/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1982/30] | Title | German: | Zugangskontrollkarte | [1982/30] | English: | Access control card | [1982/30] | French: | Carte de contrôle d'accès | [1982/30] | Examination procedure | 04.02.1983 | Examination requested [1983/16] | 22.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 25.08.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1989/28] | 30.03.1989 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1989/28] | Appeal following examination | 16.06.1986 | Appeal received No. T0397/86 | 22.08.1986 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.01.1989 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1989/04] | 30.03.1989 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3806874 (EHRAT K); | [X]US4102493 (MORENO ROLAND); | [A]FR2032166 (CAMBORNAC MICHEL, et al); | [A]US3745569 (OSTROFF E, et al) |