EP0056331 - Process and apparatus for treating electrically conductive matrices and products produced by the process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.1988 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METAFUSE LIMITED 20 Meteor Drive Rexdale Ontario / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1982/29] | For all designated states METAFUSE LIMITED 20 Meteor Drive Rexdale Ontario / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ady, Joseph 26 Edenbridge Drive Islington Ontario, M9A 3E9 / CA | [1982/29] | Representative(s) | Wilson, Nicholas Martin, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/29] | Wilson, Nicholas Martin, et al WITHERS & ROGERS 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 82300138.3 | 12.01.1982 | [1982/29] | Priority number, date | US19810224762 | 13.01.1981 Original published format: US 224762 | US19810319678 | 09.11.1981 Original published format: US 319678 | [1982/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0056331 | Date: | 21.07.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0056331 | Date: | 15.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C25D5/18 | [1982/29] | CPC: |
C25D5/18 (EP,KR,US);
C23C20/00 (KR);
C25D17/14 (EP);
C25D5/605 (EP,KR,US);
C25D5/623 (EP,KR,US);
C25D5/627 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/29] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Behandlung elektrisch leitender Materialien und damit erhaltene Produkte | [1982/29] | English: | Process and apparatus for treating electrically conductive matrices and products produced by the process | [1982/29] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour traiter des matrices électroconductrices et produits ainsi obtenus | [1982/29] | Examination procedure | 21.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/14] | 16.02.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 23.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.10.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.04.1987 | CH | 15.04.1987 | LI | 15.04.1987 | NL | 15.04.1987 | SE | 30.04.1987 | [1997/17] |
Former [1989/23] | AT | 15.04.1987 | |
CH | 15.04.1987 | ||
LI | 15.04.1987 | ||
NL | 15.04.1987 | ||
SE | 30.04.1987 | ||
Former [1989/18] | AT | 15.04.1987 | |
NL | 15.04.1987 | ||
SE | 30.04.1987 | ||
Former [1989/12] | AT | 15.04.1987 | |
NL | 15.04.1987 | ||
Former [1988/51] | NL | 15.04.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR774077 (FORTIN & SAUNIER ETS); | [A]US3743590 (ROLL R); | [A]US4206028 (INOUE KIYOSHI [JP]); | [A]DE3020824 (INOUE JAPAX RES) | [A] - PLATING, vol. 56, no. 8, August 1969, pages 909 - 913, V.A.LAMB: 'Electroplating with current pulses in the microsecond range' | [A] - TRANSACTIONS OF THE INSTITUTE OF METAL FINISHING, vol. 56, no. 2, February 1978; J.MANN: 'Periodic reverse current process in electroplating using acid copper electrolyte' | Examination | - Guy, Metall Runde für Ingenieure, Akad. Verlagsges. Ffm (1979) Bd 7 p. 354/355 |