EP0057068 - Improvements in or relating to non-destructive testing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.10.1986 [1986/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states British Steel Corporation 9 Albert Embankment London SE1 7SN / GB | [1982/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cornforth, Alexander Rankin 2 Kettering Road Stanion, Kettering Northamptonshire / GB | 02 /
Lane, Richard Barry 5 Vine Close Oundle, Peterborough Northamptonshire / GB | 03 /
James, Clifford Thomas 21 Finch Hattom Drive Gretton, Corby Northamptonshire / GB | [1982/31] | Representative(s) | Heath, Peter William Murray FRY HEATH & SPENCE The Old College 53 High Street Horley Surrey RH6 7BN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/37] | Heath, Peter William Murray FRY HEATH & SPENCE The Old College 53 High Street Horley Surrey RH6 7BN / GB | ||
Former [1982/31] | Heath, Peter William Murray British Steel Corporation Patent Section, NLA Tower 12 Addiscombe Road Croydon Surrey CR9 3JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 82300206.8 | 15.01.1982 | [1982/31] | Priority number, date | GB19810002501 | 27.01.1981 Original published format: GB 8102501 | [1982/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0057068 | Date: | 04.08.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0057068 | Date: | 23.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/00, G01N27/90 | [1982/31] | CPC: |
G01N27/9013 (EP);
G01N29/262 (EP);
G01N2291/02854 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, NL, SE [1982/31] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur zerstörungsfreien Werkstoffprüfung | [1982/31] | English: | Improvements in or relating to non-destructive testing apparatus | [1982/31] | French: | Dispositif pour le contrôle non-destructif d'un matériau | [1982/31] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 04.02.1983 | Examination requested [1983/16] | 18.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.04.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2854374 ; | [Y]US3540266 ; | [Y]DE1811079 ; | [Y]GB2015736 ; | [Y]GB2014317 ; | [A]DE2652085 |