EP0056716 - Marker channel telemetry system for a medical device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 27.11.1989 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. 3055 Old Highway Eight P.O. Box 1453 Minneapolis Minnesota 55440 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/30] | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. 3055 Old Highway Eight P.O. Box 1453 Minneapolis Minnesota 55440 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Markowitz, Harold T. 2536 149th Avenue N.E. Anoka Minnesota 55303 / US | [1982/30] | Representative(s) | Tomlinson, Kerry John, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/30] | Tomlinson, Kerry John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. European Patent Attorneys Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 82300214.2 | 15.01.1982 | [1982/30] | Priority number, date | US19810225561 | 16.01.1981 Original published format: US 225561 | [1982/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0056716 | Date: | 28.07.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0056716 | Date: | 04.08.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0056716 | Date: | 24.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/08, A61B5/07 | [1982/30] | CPC: |
A61N1/37211 (EP,US);
A61B5/0031 (EP,US);
A61N1/37254 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/30] | Title | German: | Fernmesssystem mit einem Zeitmarkenkanal für ein medizinisches Gerät | [1982/30] | English: | Marker channel telemetry system for a medical device | [1982/30] | French: | Système de télémétrie à canal de marquage pour un dispositif médical | [1982/30] | Examination procedure | 10.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/12] | 08.05.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.07.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.01.1986
18.02.1986
ADMISSIBLE Siemens - Elema AB, Solna (SE) Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | [1986/12] | 24.02.1986 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.12.1986 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.12.1986 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 16.02.1987 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 03.12.1987 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 13.06.1989 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1990/03] | Appeal following opposition | 29.01.1988 | Appeal received No. T0053/88 | 31.03.1988 | Statement of grounds filed | 13.06.1989 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 13.06.1989 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.06.1989 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8002498 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]); | [Y]US4144892 (AUERBACH ALBERT A); | [A]EP0001708 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]); | [A]FR2379104 (PACESETTER SYST [US]); | [A]GB2026870 (MEDTRONIC INC); | [A]US4223678 (LANGER ALOIS A, et al); | [P]GB2060174 (MEDRAD INC, et al); | [E]EP0049812 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |