EP0076555 - Forced convection oven [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.1986 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.07.1986 [1986/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GER-BELL INVESTMENTS LTD. 4571 Maine Avenue Powell-River British Columbia / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1984/29] | For all designated states GER-BELL INVESTMENTS LTD. 4571 Maine Avenue Powell-River British Columbia / CA | ||
Former [1983/15] | For all designated states OMEGA AIR FLOW-21, LTD. 4883 - 12A Avenue South Delta British Columbia V4M 2B6 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pryputsch, Gunter Gehrhart 4883-12A Avenue South Delta British Columbia, V4M 2B6 / CA | 02 /
Leila, Lennox Michael 4851 Fortune Avenue Richmond British Columbia, V7E 4S1 / CA | 03 /
Parkinson, Gerald Eric 4483 West 2nd Avenue Vancouver British Columbia, V6R 1K6 / CA | 04 /
Arneson, Leonard Anton 2984 Glen Drive Port Coquitlam British Columbia, V3B 2P5 / CA | [1983/15] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Peter Arthur, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/29] | Jackson, Peter Arthur, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1983/15] | Jennings, Guy Kenneth GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 82300220.9 | 15.01.1982 | [1983/15] | Priority number, date | US19810308158 | 05.10.1981 Original published format: US 308158 | [1983/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0076555 | Date: | 13.04.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0076555 | Date: | 07.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | A47J39/00, F24C15/32 | [1983/15] | CPC: |
F24C15/322 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, LI, NL, SE [1983/15] | Title | German: | Ofen mit Zwangsumlaufheizung | [1983/15] | English: | Forced convection oven | [1983/15] | French: | Four à circulation d'air forcée | [1983/15] | File destroyed: | 18.07.1996 | Examination procedure | 25.08.1983 | Examination requested [1983/44] | 09.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.01.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1198612 (BURGER EISENWERKE AG); | [A]US3828760 (FARBER M, et al); | [AD]US4155294 (LANGHAMMER JEROME [CA], et al) |