EP0057093 - High intensity discharge lamps [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.1986 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.07.1986 [1986/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORTH AMERICAN PHILIPS LIGHTING CORPORATION 100 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | [1985/14] |
Former [1982/31] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thornton, William Andrus 27 Harvard Road Cranford New Jersey / US | 02 /
Larson, Daniel Alfred 7 Highview Terrace Cedar Grove New Jersey / US | 03 /
Chen, Edward 156 Forest Road Glen Rock New Jersey / US | [1982/31] | Representative(s) | Evers, Johannes Hubertus Marie INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V, Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/14] | Evers, Johannes Hubertus Maria INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V, Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1982/31] | van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 23, Centre Heights London NW3 6JG / GB | Application number, filing date | 82300327.2 | 22.01.1982 | [1982/31] | Priority number, date | US19810228039 | 23.01.1981 Original published format: US 228039 | [1982/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0057093 | Date: | 04.08.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0057093 | Date: | 03.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H01J61/18 | [1982/31] | CPC: |
H01J61/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1982/31] | Title | German: | Entladungslampen hoher Intensität | [1982/31] | English: | High intensity discharge lamps | [1982/31] | French: | Lampes à décharge à haute intensité | [1982/31] | Examination procedure | 04.02.1983 | Examination requested [1983/16] | 31.01.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.12.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1316803 [ ] (GEN ELECTRIC); | US4027190 [ ] (SHINTANI TAKAO, et al); | US3781586 [ ] (JOHNSON P); | US3882345 [ ] (KAZEK GREGORY J, et al); | US4001626 [ ] (DROP PETER CORNELIS, et al); | USRE27953E [ ]; | US3740605 [ ] (DIVOIX J, et al) |