EP0064798 - Sensing devices for mounting in chamber walls and method of manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELMWOOD SENSORS LIMITED Elm Road North Shields Tyne & Wear, NE29 8SE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/46] | For all designated states ELMWOOD SENSORS LIMITED Elm Road North Shields Tyne & Wear, NE29 8SE / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krohn, Rasmus Aage Rosenlund 39 Townsend Crescent Morpeth NE61 2XT Northumberland / GB | [1982/46] | Representative(s) | Garratt, Peter Douglas, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/46] | Garratt, Peter Douglas, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 82300426.2 | 27.01.1982 | [1982/46] | Priority number, date | GB19810002409 | 27.01.1981 Original published format: GB 8102409 | [1982/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0064798 | Date: | 17.11.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G01K1/08, G01K5/72, G01K7/22, G01K7/16 | [1982/46] | CPC: |
G01K7/16 (EP,US);
G01K1/08 (EP,US);
G01K5/72 (EP,US);
G01K7/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1982/46] | Title | German: | Messfühler zum Einbau in Messkammerwände und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [1982/46] | English: | Sensing devices for mounting in chamber walls and method of manufacture | [1982/46] | French: | Dispositif capteurs pouvant être fixés dans la paroi d'une chambre de mesure et procédé de fabrication | [1982/46] | File destroyed: | 03.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 14.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/13] | 16.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/28] | 06.02.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1986/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1986 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]FR2441157 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]); | [X]US4211114 (HOOD STANLEY R [US]); | [X]US3077777 (BOOK HERBERT W); | [A]FR1462680 (AMP INC); | [X]US4243968 (SCOTT DOUGLAS R); | [P]FR2470370 (RENAULT [FR]); | [P]US4246787 (HARPER V PAUL); | [P]DE3022470 (KUENZER GMBH MESS PRUEF UND RE [DE]) |