EP0057575 - Method of forming stabilized coal-oil mixtures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.03.1987 [1987/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE STANDARD OIL COMPANY Midland Building Cleveland, Ohio 44115 / US | [1986/11] |
Former [1982/32] | For all designated states Gulf & Western Manufacturing Company 1 Gulf & Western Plaza New York New York / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eckman, Carl E. 1207 7th Avenue Swarthmore Pennsylvania 19081 / US | [1982/32] | Representative(s) | Lambert, Hugh Richmond, et al D. YOUNG & CO., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1982/32] | Application number, filing date | 82300447.8 | 28.01.1982 | [1982/32] | Priority number, date | US19810230064 | 29.01.1981 Original published format: US 230064 | [1982/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0057575 | Date: | 11.08.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0057575 | Date: | 10.08.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0057575 | Date: | 09.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C10L1/32 | [1982/32] | CPC: |
C10L1/322 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | GB, SE [1985/52] |
Former [1982/32] | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Methode zur Bildung stabilisierter Kohle-Öl-Gemische | [1982/32] | English: | Method of forming stabilized coal-oil mixtures | [1982/32] | French: | Méthode de formation de mélanges charbon-huile stabilisés | [1982/32] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 28.01.1984 | Examination requested [1984/15] | 24.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.07.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1985 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.01.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB155212 (JOHN JAMES VICTOR ARMSTRONG); | [A]FR745506 ; | [A]US4101293 (KRAUSE ARTHUR WALDEMAR, et al); | [A]GB2009783 (ENERGY & MINERALS RES CO); | [A]US4165969 (DEVINEY MARVIN L JR [US], et al); | [APD]EP0032811 (GULF & WESTERN INDUSTRIES [US]); | [XP]US4306883 (ECKMAN CARL E) |