EP0059043 - Surface active compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1986 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.08.1986 [1986/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1982/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hepworth, Paul 13 Bankside Close Upper Poppleton York / GB | 02 /
Scott, Norman 2 Marton Drive Billingham Stockton-on-Tees Cleveland / GB | [1982/35] | Representative(s) | Locke, Timothy John, et al ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/35] | Locke, Timothy John, et al ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 82300640.8 | 09.02.1982 | [1982/35] | Priority number, date | GB19810005257 | 19.02.1981 Original published format: GB 8105257 | [1982/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0059043 | Date: | 01.09.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0059043 | Date: | 21.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/29, C11D1/14 | [1982/35] | CPC: |
C11D3/3707 (EP);
C11D1/29 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1982/35] | Title | German: | Oberflächenaktive Zusammensetzungen | [1982/35] | English: | Surface active compositions | [1982/35] | French: | Compositions tensio-actives | [1982/35] | Examination procedure | 25.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/14] | 13.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.01.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2198992 [ ] (PROCTER & GAMBLE EUROP [BE]); | FR2216346 [ ] (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]); | US3963649 [ ] (SPADINI GIANFRANCO LUIGI, et al); | GB2054635 [ ] (KAO CORP); | US4304680 [ ] (WIXON HAROLD E) | Examination | DE2948791 | EP0024711 | EP0034039 |