EP0059074 - Anthelmintic composition and the use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1985 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.1985 [1985/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANKYO COMPANY LIMITED No. 1-6, 3-chome Nihonbashi Honcho Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/35] | For all designated states SANKYO COMPANY LIMITED No. 1-6, 3-chome Nihonbashi Honcho Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kitano, Noritoshi Biological Research Laboratories Sankyo Company Limited 2-58, 1-chome Hiromachi Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [1982/35] | Representative(s) | Gibson, Christian John Robert, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/35] | Gibson, Christian John Robert, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 82300829.7 | 18.02.1982 | [1982/35] | Priority number, date | JP19810025058 | 23.02.1981 Original published format: JP 2505881 | [1982/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0059074 | Date: | 01.09.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0059074 | Date: | 10.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/415, A61K31/60, A61K31/495, A61K31/47, A61K31/71, // (A61K31/60, 31:495, 31:415, 31:47, 31:365) | [1982/35] | CPC: |
A61K31/60 (EP,US);
A61K31/415 (EP,US);
A61K31/47 (EP,US);
A61K31/495 (EP,US);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P33/10 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/415, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/415, A61K31/365 (EP,US);
A61K31/47, A61K31/365 (US,EP);
A61K31/495, A61K31/365 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL [1982/35] | Title | German: | Anthelmintische Zusammensetzung und ihre Verwendung | [1982/35] | English: | Anthelmintic composition and the use thereof | [1982/35] | French: | Composition anthelmintique et son utilisation | [1982/35] | Examination procedure | 07.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/07] | 30.12.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.03.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.07.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0001689 (MERCK & CO INC [US]); | [X]EP0007812 (MERCK & CO INC [US]); | [XP]US4289760 (MROZIK HELMUT H, et al); | [AD]GB1390336 (SANKYO CO); | [AD]EP0002916 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) |