EP0060088 - Chewing gum [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.1986 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 10.05.1989 [1989/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INDIANA UNIVERSITY FOUNDATION Showalter House P.O. Box 500 Bloomington Indiana 47402 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/37] | For all designated states INDIANA UNIVERSITY FOUNDATION Showalter House P.O. Box 500 Bloomington Indiana 47402 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muhler, Joseph Charles Box 36 Howe Indiana 46746 / US | 02 /
Ream, Ronald Lee 221 Briar Lane North Aurora Illinois 60542 / US | 03 /
Kleber, Carl Joseph 8331 Tewksbury Court Fort Wayne Indiana 46815 / US | 04 /
Moore, David Milton 2 S 012 Tree Tops Lane Wheaton Illinois 60187 / US | [1982/37] | Representative(s) | Bull, Michael Alan, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/37] | Bull, Michael Alan, et al Haseltine Lake & Co. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 82301093.9 | 04.03.1982 | [1982/37] | Priority number, date | US19810240793 | 05.03.1981 Original published format: US 240793 | US19820339754 | 15.01.1982 Original published format: US 339754 | [1982/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0060088 | Date: | 15.09.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0060088 | Date: | 29.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0060088 | Date: | 19.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.1983 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/16, A61K7/24, A61K9/68 | [1982/37] | CPC: |
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/24 (EP,US);
A61K8/26 (EP,US);
A61K8/365 (EP,US);
A61K2800/412 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/50] |
Former [1982/37] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Kaugummi | [1982/37] | English: | Chewing gum | [1982/37] | French: | Gomme à mâcher | [1982/37] | Examination procedure | 02.07.1982 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) IT | 13.09.1982 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.09.1983 | Examination requested [1983/45] | 20.06.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.08.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.04.1982 | IT   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 19.06.1985 | CH | 19.06.1985 | LI | 19.06.1985 | [1989/19] |
Former [1988/04] | BE | 19.06.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP49024224 ; | [X]US2004957 (MESSNER ARTHUR J); | [Y]FR1594709 ; | [YD]US4122163 (MUHLER JOSEPH C, et al); | [A]GB136442 (ANDRESEN VIGGO VALDEMAR JULIUS [DK]); | [A]FR892427 ; | [A]GB935703 (UNILEVER LTD) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 82, no. 10, 10th March 1975, page 461, no. 64344r, Columbus Ohio (USA); & JP - A - 49 024 224 (SUNSTAR DENTRIFRICE CO., LTD.) (21-06-1974), & JP49024224 A 00000000 |