EP0062458 - Motor vehicle transmission apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 03.10.1987 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.1987 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 19.11.1987 [1987/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 27-8, Jingumae, 6-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo 150 / JP | [1982/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishikawa, Masao 912-1, Oizumigakuen-cho Nerima-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Hattori, Torao 1-13-28, Shirako Wako-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Aoki, Tasashi 15-51-514, Honcho Wako-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 04 /
Yoshizawa, Hiroshi 437, Komabayashi Kamifukuoka-shi Saitama-ken / JP | [1982/41] | Representative(s) | MacFarlane, John Anthony Ch., et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28, Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/41] | MacFarlane, John Anthony Christopher, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28, Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 82301573.0 | 25.03.1982 | [1982/41] | Priority number, date | JP19810050818 | 04.04.1981 Original published format: JP 5081881 | [1982/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0062458 | Date: | 13.10.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0062458 | Date: | 24.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/43] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0062458 | Date: | 19.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B60K41/02 | [1982/41] | CPC: |
F16H61/20 (EP,US);
F16H61/0206 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1982/41] | Title | German: | Kraftübertragung für Motorfahrzeug | [1982/41] | English: | Motor vehicle transmission apparatus | [1982/41] | French: | Transmission de vehicule à moteur | [1982/41] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 29.09.1982 | Examination requested [1982/48] | 23.01.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.04.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.05.1985
13.06.1985
ADMISSIBLE Volkswagenwerk AG Postfach D-3180 Wolfsburg 1 / DE | [1985/31] | 11.09.1985 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.01.1986 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.01.1986 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 19.06.1987 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 30.06.1987 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP55008972 [ ]; | [A]US2344399 (EATON WILFRED A); | [A]DE553675 (AUTOTECHNIK M B H GES) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN,unexamined applications, field M, vol. 4, no. 37, march 27. 1980, THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNEMENT, page 25; & JP-A-55 008 972, & JP55008972 A 00000000 |