EP0083831 - Process for producing sulfuric acid and ammonia [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.1986 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fertilizer Development S.A. 44, Avenue de la Gare Case Postale 898 Lausanne / CH | [1983/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baniel, Abraham M. 8, Emile Zola Street Jerusalem / IL | 02 /
Eyal, Arie M. Kibbutz Ramat Rachel, 90900 / IL | [1983/29] | Representative(s) | Whalley, Kevin, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/29] | Whalley, Kevin, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 82301590.4 | 25.03.1982 | [1983/29] | Priority number, date | IL19120000647 | 05.01.1982 Original published format: IL 64712 | [1983/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0083831 | Date: | 20.07.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0083831 | Date: | 24.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C01C1/02, C01B17/74 | [1983/29] | CPC: |
C01B17/745 (EP);
C01C1/028 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1983/29] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Schwefelsäure und Ammoniak | [1983/29] | English: | Process for producing sulfuric acid and ammonia | [1983/29] | French: | Procédé pour la production d'acide sulfurique et d'ammoniac | [1983/29] | Examination procedure | 01.12.1983 | Examination requested [1984/06] | 15.10.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.01.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.07.1985 | BE | 24.07.1985 | FR | 24.07.1985 | SE | 30.07.1985 | NL | 08.11.1985 | [2002/24] |
Former [1989/27] | AT | 24.07.1985 | |
BE | 24.07.1985 | ||
SE | 30.07.1985 | ||
NL | 08.11.1985 | ||
GB | 25.03.1986 | ||
Former [1988/13] | AT | 24.07.1985 | |
BE | 24.07.1985 | ||
SE | 30.07.1985 | ||
NL | 08.11.1985 | ||
Former [1988/04] | AT | 24.07.1985 | |
BE | 24.07.1985 | ||
NL | 08.11.1985 | ||
Former [1986/47] | AT | 24.07.1985 | |
NL | 08.11.1985 | ||
Former [1986/32] | NL | 08.11.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3383170 (HERBERT FURKERT, et al); | [A]CH477367 (INVENTA AG [CH]); | [AD]FR2075207 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO); | [AD]FR2141794 (ZIEREN CHEMIEBAU GMBH DR A); | [AD]FR2370694 (UGINE KUHLMANN [FR]) |