EP0061911 - Process and composition for treating phosphated metal surfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.1985 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Paint Co., Ltd. 162 oyodokita 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 531-8511 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/40] | For all designated states Nippon Paint Co., Ltd. 2-1-2, Oyodokita Oyodo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mino, Yasutake Nippon, Paint Co., Ltd. 19-17 Ikedanaka-machi Neyagawa-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Murakami, Ryoichi Nippon Paint Co., Ltd. 19-17 Ikedanaka-machi Neyagawa-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Saito, Koichi Nippon Paint Co., Ltd. 19-17 Ikedanaka-machi Neyagawa-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [1982/40] | Representative(s) | Green, Alan James, et al SANDERSON & CO. European Patent Attorneys 34, East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/40] | Green, Alan James, et al SANDERSON & CO. European Patent Attorneys 34, East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | Application number, filing date | 82301602.7 | 26.03.1982 | [1982/40] | Priority number, date | JP19810044820 | 26.03.1981 Original published format: JP 4482081 | [1982/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0061911 | Date: | 06.10.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C23F7/10, C23F7/12, C25D5/34, C25D5/36 | [1982/40] | CPC: |
C23C22/83 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, SE [1983/01] |
Former [1982/40] | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Zusammensetzung zur Behandlung phosphatierter Metalloberflächen | [1982/40] | English: | Process and composition for treating phosphated metal surfaces | [1982/40] | French: | Procédé et composition pour le traitement de surfaces métalliques phosphatées | [1982/40] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 26.07.1982 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) FR, GB, IT, NL | 07.10.1982 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.03.1983 | Examination requested [1983/19] | 09.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/11] | 20.09.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1985/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.04.1982 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 26.04.1982 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 26.04.1982 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 26.04.1982 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.04.1984 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3076734 (SCHIMKUS KURT E); | [Y]US4110129 (MATSUSHIMA YASUNOBU, et al); | [Y]US4148670 (KELLY TIMM L); | [Y]US4187127 (AYANO YUKIHIKO [JP], et al) |