EP0063437 - Closure device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1985 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1983/04] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1982/43] | For all designated states WINDMILL PLASTICS LIMITED 61 Windmill Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Varndell, John Alfred 9 Duval Place Bagshot Surrey / GB | [1982/43] | Representative(s) | Hunter, Keith Roger Ian, et al Shell International Petroleum Company Limited, Intellectual Property Division, P.O. Box 662 London SE1 7NE / GB | [1983/41] |
Former [1983/04] | Rogers, Roy Charles 4 York Road London SE1 7NA / GB | ||
Former [1982/43] | Weston, Walter PHILLIPS & LEIGH 7 Staple Inn Holborn London WC1V 7QF / GB | Application number, filing date | 82301741.3 | 01.04.1982 | [1982/43] | Priority number, date | GB19810010878 | 07.04.1981 Original published format: GB 8110878 | [1982/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0063437 | Date: | 27.10.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0063437 | Date: | 23.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B65D45/02, A47K1/14, E03C1/23, H01H37/54 | [1982/43] | CPC: |
A61L9/12 (EP,US);
A47K1/14 (EP,US);
B65D39/00 (EP,US);
B65D39/0029 (EP,US);
H01H37/54 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/43] | Title | German: | Verschlussvorrichtung | [1982/43] | English: | Closure device | [1982/43] | French: | Dispositif de fermeture | [1982/43] | Examination procedure | 16.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/04] | 25.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.02.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.07.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.04.1985 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2024227 (JONES HERBERT W); | [A]US2968047 (STILBORN HERBERT G); | [X]FR1253750 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC); | [X]DE2233383 (LIOU SHU LIEN); | [A]US3876102 (WHARTON FRANKLIN EUGENE); | [A]US3934745 (LOVELL WALTER C); | [A]US4149138 (PEVZNER MARK G, et al) |