EP0083832 - Process for separating carbonic acid gas from methane-rich gas [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 19.04.1989 [1989/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEITETSU KAGAKU CO., LTD. 346-1, Miyanishi Harimacho, Kako-gun Hyogo-ken 673-01 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/29] | For all designated states SEITETSU KAGAKU CO., LTD. 346-1, Miyanishi Harimacho, Kako-gun Hyogo-ken 673-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uno, Masaru 849-1, Nishifutami Futami-cho Akashi-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Ihara, Satoshi 11-13, Uenomaru 3-chome Akashi-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Tanabe, Takeo 23-2, Torimi-cho 3-chome Nara-shi Nara-ken / JP | 04 /
Hiraoka, Masakatsu 39-763, Kowataokurayama Uji-shi Kyoto / JP | [1983/29] | Representative(s) | Bond, Bentley George, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/29] | Bond, Bentley George, et al Haseltine Lake & Co. 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 82301989.8 | 19.04.1982 | [1983/29] | Priority number, date | JP19820003595 | 12.01.1982 Original published format: JP 359582 | JP19820044194 | 18.03.1982 Original published format: JP 4419482 | [1983/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0083832 | Date: | 20.07.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0083832 | Date: | 23.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/04, C02F11/04 | [1983/29] | CPC: |
C12M47/18 (EP,US);
B01D53/047 (EP,US);
C02F3/28 (EP,US);
C12M21/04 (EP,US);
B01D2253/102 (EP,US);
B01D2253/104 (EP,US);
B01D2253/106 (EP,US);
B01D2253/108 (EP,US);
B01D2253/116 (EP,US);
B01D2253/25 (EP,US);
B01D2253/308 (EP,US);
B01D2256/245 (EP,US);
B01D2257/504 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40037 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40064 (EP,US);
B01D2259/402 (EP,US);
B01D2259/403 (EP,US);
B01D2259/4062 (EP,US);
B01D53/0476 (EP,US);
Y02C20/40 (EP,US);
Y02E50/30 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/29] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Abtrennung von de CO2 aus einem methanreichen Gas | [1983/29] | English: | Process for separating carbonic acid gas from methane-rich gas | [1983/29] | French: | Procédé de séparation de CO2 d'un gaz riche en méthane | [1983/29] | Examination procedure | 28.11.1983 | Examination requested [1984/05] | 20.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.04.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 23.07.1986 | SE | 31.07.1986 | [1989/16] |
Former [1988/34] | NL | 23.07.1986 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP56065690 ; | [A]JP56065689 ; | [X]US4077779 (SIRCAR SHIVAJI, et al); | [X]DE2827969 | [A] - Patent Abstracts of Japan, Vol. 5, No. 132, 22 August 1981; & JP-A-56 065 690, & JP56065690 A 19810822 | [A] - Patent Abstracts of Japan, Vol. 5, No. 132, 22 August 1981; & JP-A-56 065 689, & JP56065689 A 19810822 |