EP0065370 - Sterile dressing and preparation thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1985 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.01.1986 [1986/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smith and Nephew Associated Companies p.l.c. 2, Temple Place Victoria Embankment London WC2R 3BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/52] | For all designated states Smith and Nephew Associated Companies p.l.c. 2, Temple Place Victoria Embankment London WC2R 3BP / GB | ||
Former [1982/47] | For all designated states Smith and Nephew Associated Companies Limited 2, Temple Place Victoria Embankment London WC2R 3BP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tharratt, John 73 Graham Avenue Hessle Road Hull / GB | 02 /
Harlock, Sally-Jane 562 Holderness Road Hull HU9 3ET / GB | [1982/47] | Representative(s) | Cole, William Gwyn Corporate Patents Department Smith and Nephew Research Limited Gilston Park Harlow Essex CM20 2RQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/47] | Cole, William Gwyn Corporate Patents Department Smith and Nephew Research Limited Gilston Park Harlow Essex CM20 2RQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 82302204.1 | 29.04.1982 | [1982/47] | Priority number, date | GB19810013624 | 02.05.1981 Original published format: GB 8113624 | [1982/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0065370 | Date: | 24.11.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0065370 | Date: | 23.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A61L15/03, A61K9/70 | [1982/47] | CPC: |
A61L15/46 (EP);
A61L2300/202 (EP);
A61L2300/206 (EP);
A61L2300/404 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/47] | Title | German: | Steriler Wundverband und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1982/47] | English: | Sterile dressing and preparation thereof | [1982/47] | French: | Pansement stérile et sa préparation | [1982/47] | Examination procedure | 28.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/15] | 07.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.07.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0020777 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]); | [YD]GB1108837 (ASTRA PHARMA PROD); | [YD]US4197289 (LIPINSKY EDWARD S [US], et al); | [Y]US3328259 (ANDERSON ROBERT J); | [A]US3598122 (ZAFFARONI ALEJANDRO) |