EP0068610 - A power spinner for rotating a Kelly joint [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.1986 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.07.1986 [1986/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WEATHERFORD/LAMB, INC. Suite 200 17, Briar Hollow Houston Texas 77027 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/01] | For all designated states WEATHERFORD/LAMB, INC. Suite 200 17, Briar Hollow Houston Texas 77027 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
True, Martin Earl 2203 Looscan Houston Texas 77019 / US | 02 /
Sullivan, Clarence William 9713 Warwana Houston Texas 77080 / US | [1983/01] | Representative(s) | Westwood, Edgar Bruce, et al STEVENS, HEWLETT & PERKINS 5, Quality Court Chancery Lane London WC2A 1HZ / GB | [1983/01] | Application number, filing date | 82302399.9 | 11.05.1982 | [1983/01] | Priority number, date | US19810278438 | 24.06.1981 Original published format: US 278438 | [1983/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0068610 | Date: | 05.01.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0068610 | Date: | 23.03.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0068610 | Date: | 24.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | E21B4/14 | [1983/01] | CPC: |
E21B19/16 (EP,US);
Y10T74/138 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19279 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1983/01] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Verdrehen einer Mitnehmerstange | [1983/01] | English: | A power spinner for rotating a Kelly joint | [1983/01] | French: | Dispositif pour la mise en rotation d'une tige d'entraînement | [1983/01] | File destroyed: | 25.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 15.09.1983 | Examination requested [1983/49] | 10.10.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.11.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3122211 (HART WILSON JOHN, et al); | [AD]US3144085 (HASHA MALVERN M); | [AD]US3212578 (HASHA MALVERN M); | [A]US3330164 (HART WILSON JOHN); | [A]US3390728 (JOSEF BARTOS); | [A]US4092881 (JURGENS RAINER, et al); | [A]US4221269 (HUDSON RAY E) |