EP0065869 - Liquid crystalline materials incorporating dichroic dye and optical displays utilizing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.1985 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.1985 [1985/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Crystaloid Electronics Company 5282 Hudson Drive P.O. Box 628 Hudson Ohio 44236 / US | [1984/24] |
Former [1982/48] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION 100 Erieview Plaza Cleveland Ohio 44114 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ferrato, Joseph Patrick 2935 Millboro Road Stow Ohio 44224 / US | [1982/48] | Representative(s) | Spall, Christopher John, et al Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/20] | Spall, Christopher John, et al BARKER, BRETTELL & DUNCAN 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | ||
Former [1982/48] | Douglas, John Andrew Eaton House Staines Road Hounslow Middlesex TW4 5DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 82302543.2 | 19.05.1982 | [1982/48] | Priority number, date | US19810265769 | 21.05.1981 Original published format: US 265769 | [1982/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0065869 | Date: | 01.12.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0065869 | Date: | 25.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/34, G02F1/133, // C09B29/00 | [1982/48] | CPC: |
C09K19/601 (EP);
C09B29/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1982/48] | Title | German: | Flüssigkristalline Materialien, welche dichroitischen Farbstoff enthalten, und deren Verwendung in optischen Anzeigegeräten | [1982/48] | English: | Liquid crystalline materials incorporating dichroic dye and optical displays utilizing same | [1982/48] | French: | Matériaux à base de cristaux liquides contenant du colorant dichroique et dispositifs d'affichage optique les utilisant | [1982/48] | Examination procedure | 06.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/08] | 24.06.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.01.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | Examination | - Keine |