EP0068622 - Dispersions of solid fuel in oil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.1985 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The British Petroleum Company p.l.c. Britannic House Moor Lane London EC2Y 9BU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/01] | For all designated states The British Petroleum Company p.l.c. Britannic House Moor Lane London EC2Y 9BU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grint, Alan The British Petroleum Company p.l.c. Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex, TW16 7LN / GB | 02 /
Veal, Christopher John The British Petroleum Company p.l.c. Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex, TW16 7LN / GB | [1983/01] | Representative(s) | MacLeod, Malcolm, et al c/o The British Petroleum Company plc Patents Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex, TW16 7LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/01] | MacLeod, Malcolm, et al c/o The British Petroleum Company plc Patents Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex, TW16 7LN / GB | Application number, filing date | 82302578.8 | 20.05.1982 | [1983/01] | Priority number, date | GB19810015587 | 21.05.1981 Original published format: GB 8115587 | [1983/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0068622 | Date: | 05.01.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0068622 | Date: | 10.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C10L1/32 | [1983/01] | CPC: |
C10L1/322 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1983/01] | Title | German: | Feste Brennstoff in Öl-Dispersionen | [1983/01] | English: | Dispersions of solid fuel in oil | [1983/01] | French: | Dispersion d'un combustible solide dans l'huile | [1983/01] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 11.06.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/01] | 11.07.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1986/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.04.1985 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1985 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3764547 ; | [YD]GB1523193 |