EP0067018 - Material working machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.1987 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.06.1987 [1987/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pulsar International Limited Les Banques Guernsey, Channel Islands / GB | [1986/06] |
Former [1982/50] | For all designated states FRUIT EXPORT HOLDINGS LIMITED Les Banques Guernsey Channel Islands / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carternock, Frederick Arthur 4 Sunnyside Road Sandgate Folkestone Kent / GB | [1982/50] | Representative(s) | Griffin, Kenneth David, et al Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/06] | Griffin, Kenneth David, et al Saunders & Dolleymore 9, Rickmansworth Road Watford Hertfordshire WD1 7HE / GB | ||
Former [1983/12] | Saunders, Harry SAUNDERS & DOLLEYMORE 9, Rickmansworth Road Watford Hertfordshire WD1 7HE / GB | ||
Former [1982/50] | Jenkins, Richard Gray R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 82302780.0 | 28.05.1982 | [1982/50] | Priority number, date | GB19810016624 | 01.06.1981 Original published format: GB 8116624 | [1982/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0067018 | Date: | 15.12.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0067018 | Date: | 02.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1982 | Classification | IPC: | E02F3/42, E02F3/84 | [1982/50] | CPC: |
E02F3/32 (EP,US);
E02F3/405 (EP,US);
E02F3/425 (EP,US);
E02F9/221 (EP,US);
Y10S37/904 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/50] | Title | German: | Arbeitsmaschine für Materialien | [1982/50] | English: | Material working machines | [1982/50] | French: | Machine de travail de matières | [1982/50] | Examination procedure | 25.05.1983 | Examination requested [1983/32] | 30.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.11.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.04.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1939289 (BAKER ROBERT D); | [X]US2986294 (GRANRYD THORVALD G); | [A]US3443327 (MARTIN WILLIAM E); | [A]DE1634708 (BILGER FA FRIEDR); | [X]US3677426 (LUCK DIETER G); | [A]US3762481 (ALLEN J, et al) |