EP0067601 - Tobacco treatment process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 17.03.1990 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.1990 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 02.05.1990 [1990/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY 403 North Main Street Winston-Salem North Carolina 27102 / US | [1982/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mays, Charles Denson 360 Doub Road Lewisville North Carolina 27023 / US | 02 /
Wagoner, Max Allen 2539 Alderney Lane Winston-Salem North Carolina 27103 / US | 03 /
Williard, Daniel Gray 310 Meadowview Drive Winston-Salem North Carolina 27107 / US | [1982/51] | Representative(s) | Skailes, Humphrey John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/51] | Skailes, Humphrey John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 82302784.2 | 28.05.1982 | [1982/51] | Priority number, date | US19810269086 | 02.06.1981 Original published format: US 269086 | [1982/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0067601 | Date: | 22.12.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0067601 | Date: | 16.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/29] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0067601 | Date: | 02.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.11.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A24B15/30 | [1982/51] | CPC: |
A24B15/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Behandlung von Tabak | [1982/51] | English: | Tobacco treatment process | [1982/51] | French: | Procédé de traitement de tabac | [1982/51] | Examination procedure | 08.03.1983 | Examination requested [1983/20] | 09.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.11.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.03.1987
14.04.1987
ADMISSIBLE Martin Brinkmann AG Postfach 10 79 05 D-2800 Bremen / DE | [1987/19] | 21.05.1987 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.11.1987 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M08) | 20.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 13.04.1989 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 07.06.1989 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 09.10.1989 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.10.1989 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.11.1989 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 14.02.1990 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3085581 (SHELDON ROSENBERG); | [A]GB1166296 (HAUNI WERKE KOERBER & CO KG [DE]); | [A]FR2160213 (SVENSKA TOBAKS AB); | [AP]GB2075373 (HAUNI WERKE KOERBER & CO KG) |