EP0069470 - Appliance control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.1984 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PITTWAY CORPORATION 333 Skokie Boulevard Northbrook Illinois 60062 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/02] | For all designated states PITTWAY CORPORATION 333 Skokie Boulevard Northbrook Illinois 60062 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwarzbach, Richard J. 1334 Wincester Naperville Illinois 60540 / US | 02 /
Keeler, Manley S. 27W570 95th Street Naperville Illinois 60565 / US | 03 /
Cavaiani, Randy J. 3955 Island Circle Hanover Park Illinois 60103 / US | 04 /
Chapman, Michael K. 1411 Stonehenge Drive Sycamore Illinois 60178 / US | [1983/02] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/02] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82302945.9 | 08.06.1982 | [1983/02] | Priority number, date | US19810271244 | 08.06.1981 Original published format: US 271244 | [1983/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0069470 | Date: | 12.01.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H02J13/00, H05B37/02 | [1983/02] | CPC: |
G05B19/0421 (EP,US);
H02J13/00004 (EP,US);
H02J13/00007 (EP,US);
H05B47/185 (EP,US);
H02J2310/12 (EP);
Y02B70/30 (EP,US);
Y02B90/20 (EP,US);
Y04S20/00 (EP);
Y04S20/20 (US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/02] | Title | German: | Gerätsteuerungssystem | [1983/02] | English: | Appliance control system | [1983/02] | French: | Système de commande d'appareil | [1983/02] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 07.10.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1984/12] | 17.12.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4090184 (HAMILTON II WILLIAM F); | [A]US4095139 (SYMONDS ALAN P, et al); | [A]US4163218 (WU WILLIAM I L [US]); | [A]US4194182 (MARTIN JAMES L [US]); | [A]US4241295 (WILLIAMS WALTER E JR [US]); | [A]GB2060964 (SWISH PROD) |