EP0074161 - An easy open closure and method of making same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W.R. GRACE & CO. Grace Plaza 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York New York 10036 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/11] | For all designated states W.R. GRACE & CO. Grace Plaza 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York New York 10036 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Howe, Milton A. 505 Perrin Drive Spartanburg South Carolina 29302 / US | 02 /
Compton, Stephen F. Route 2 Box 714 Wellford South Carolina 29385 / US | [1983/11] | Representative(s) | Barlow, Roy James, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/11] | Barlow, Roy James, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 82303165.3 | 17.06.1982 | [1983/11] | Priority number, date | US19810295157 | 21.08.1981 Original published format: US 295157 | US19810295158 | 21.08.1981 Original published format: US 295158 | [1983/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0074161 | Date: | 16.03.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0074161 | Date: | 28.12.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/58 | [1983/11] | CPC: |
B65D75/5855 (EP);
B65D2575/586 (EP);
B65D75/12 (EP);
B65D75/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1983/11] | Title | German: | Leicht zu öffnender Verschluss und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1983/11] | English: | An easy open closure and method of making same | [1983/11] | French: | Fermeture à ouverture facile et procédé de fabrication | [1983/11] | File destroyed: | 16.04.1993 | Examination procedure | 08.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/16] | 14.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.01.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/27] | 29.01.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1987/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1986 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3655503 [ ]; | US3623653 [ ]; | US3256981 [ ]; | US4278738 [ ]; | US4138932 [ ]; | US4126085 [ ]; | US4117934 [ ]; | US4174597 [ ]; | US3119549 [ ]; | US2997166 [ ]; | US2968396 [ ] |