EP0068762 - Method and apparatus for determining and imaging fats in biological samples [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OXFORD RESEARCH SYSTEMS LIMITED 39-41 Nuffield Way Abingdon, Oxfordshire / GB | [1986/19] |
Former [1985/40] | For all designated states OXFORD RESEARCH SYSTEMS LIMITED Alliance House Little Park Street Coventry CV1 2JZ / GB | ||
Former [1983/01] | For all designated states OXFORD RESEARCH SYSTEMS LIMITED Osney Mead Oxford OX2 0DX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gordon, Robert Emslie 35 Rivermead Road Rose Hill Oxford / GB | [1983/01] | Representative(s) | Raynor, John, et al Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/01] | Raynor, John, et al W.H. Beck, Greener & Co 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 82303196.8 | 18.06.1982 | [1983/01] | Priority number, date | GB19810018949 | 19.06.1981 Original published format: GB 8118949 | [1983/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0068762 | Date: | 05.01.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0068762 | Date: | 06.04.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0068762 | Date: | 20.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G01N24/08, G01N24/06 | [1983/11] | CPC: |
G01R33/465 (EP,US);
G01R33/485 (EP,US);
Y10S505/844 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/01] | G01N24/08, G01N24/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1983/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für die Bestimmung und die Darstellung von Fetten in biologischen Proben | [1983/01] | English: | Method and apparatus for determining and imaging fats in biological samples | [1983/01] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour la détermination et la représentation des graisses dans les échantillons biologiques | [1983/01] | Examination procedure | 03.10.1983 | Examination requested [1983/50] | 16.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 20.08.1986 | CH | 20.08.1986 | IT | 20.08.1986 | LI | 20.08.1986 | [1999/42] |
Former [1989/22] | BE | 20.08.1986 | |
CH | 20.08.1986 | ||
LI | 20.08.1986 | ||
Former [1988/04] | BE | 20.08.1986 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2103062 (VALIO MEIJERIEN); | [A]US3284700 (KINGSTON FLOYD E); | [A]GB2027208 (EMI LTD) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 19, no. 9, February 1977, pages 3517-3519, New York (USA); G.P. DOUBLE et al.: "NMR auto-shimming". | [A] - JOURNAL OF PHYSICS E; SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, vol. 6, no. 9, September 1973, London (GB); K.P.A.M. VAN PUTTE et al.: "Pulse NMR as a quick method for the determination of the solid fat content in partially crystallized fats". |