EP0068878 - Use of oxalic acid in color diffusion transfer assemblages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.1986 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [1983/01] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY (a New Jersey corporation) 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wheeler, Richard Wayne 22 Smallwood Drive Pittsford New York 14534 / US | [1983/01] | Representative(s) | Baron, Paul Alexander Clifford, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/21] | Baron, Paul Alexander Clifford, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [1983/01] | Pepper, John Herbert KODAK LIMITED Patent Department P.O. Box 114 190 High Holborn London WC1V 7EA / GB | Application number, filing date | 82303384.0 | 28.06.1982 | [1983/01] | Priority number, date | US19810278032 | 29.06.1981 Original published format: US 278032 | [1983/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0068878 | Date: | 05.01.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0068878 | Date: | 20.07.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0068878 | Date: | 11.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G03C5/54 | [1983/01] | CPC: |
G03C8/52 (EP,US);
G03C8/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31855 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3188 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31909 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31928 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/01] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Oxalsäure in einer Filmeinheit für Farbdiffusionsübertragung | [1985/37] | English: | Use of oxalic acid in color diffusion transfer assemblages | [1983/01] | French: | Utilisation d'acide oscalique dans un assemblage pour diffusion-transfert de colorants | [1983/01] |
Former [1983/01] | Verwendung von Oscalsäure in einer Filmeinheit für Farbdiffusionsübertragung | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 22.08.1983 | Examination requested [1983/43] | 30.05.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.02.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US2635048 (LAND EDWIN H); | [Y]GB1159985 (POLAROID CORP [US]); | [A]US4028103 (HANNIE DAVID EUGENE) | [AD] - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, July 1974, pages 22-24, no. 12331, Havant, Hampshire (GB); |