EP0069544 - Method and apparatus for processing stuffed sausage casing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.1987 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.09.1987 [1987/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEVRO, INC. One Johnson & Johnson Plaza New Brunswick New Jersey 08933 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | For all designated states DEVRO, INC. One Johnson & Johnson Plaza New Brunswick New Jersey 08933 / US | ||
Former [1983/02] | For all designated states DEVRO, INC. One Johnson & Johnson Plaza New Brunswick New Jersey 08933 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ziolko, Francis Joseph 126 Branch Road Bridgewater New Jersey 08807 / US | [1983/02] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/02] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 82303460.8 | 01.07.1982 | [1983/02] | Priority number, date | US19810279895 | 02.07.1981 Original published format: US 279895 | [1983/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0069544 | Date: | 12.01.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0069544 | Date: | 18.05.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0069544 | Date: | 17.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | A22C11/10 | [1983/02] | CPC: |
A22C11/108 (EP,US);
A22C13/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bearbeitung gefüllter Wursthüllen | [1983/02] | English: | Method and apparatus for processing stuffed sausage casing | [1983/02] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le traitement de boyaux à saucisses bourrés | [1983/02] | Examination procedure | 20.10.1983 | Examination requested [1984/01] | 13.06.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP84201479.7 / EP0139333 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB246522 (FERDINAND KRUSE); | [A]US1743858 (FERDINAND KRUSE); | [A]US1906372 (FLYNT LOUIS W G); | [XD]US2663982 (CONTI JOHN D); | [AD]US3435482 (ZIOLKO FRANCIS J) |