EP0070640 - Production of vinyl chloride polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 13.04.1990 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.1990 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 30.05.1990 [1990/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1983/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smallwood, Peter Vincent 88 Pixmore Way Letchworth, Hertfordshire / GB | 02 /
Zichy, Erno Laszlo 19 The Holdings Hatfield Hertfordshire / GB | [1983/04] | Representative(s) | Sheller, Alan, et al ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City, Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/04] | Sheller, Alan, et al ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City, Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 82303492.1 | 02.07.1982 | [1983/04] | Priority number, date | GB19810022306 | 20.07.1981 Original published format: GB 8122306 | [1983/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0070640 | Date: | 26.01.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0070640 | Date: | 16.03.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0070640 | Date: | 07.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/19] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0070640 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C08F14/06, C08F2/18 | [1983/04] | CPC: |
C08F14/06 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F14/06, C08F2/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/04] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Vinylchlorid Polymeren | [1983/04] | English: | Production of vinyl chloride polymers | [1983/04] | French: | Production de polymères de chlorure de vinyle | [1983/04] | Examination procedure | 23.08.1983 | Examination requested [1983/44] | 29.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.11.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
31.01.1987
07.05.1987
ADMISSIBLE Hüls Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung/PB 15 D-45764 Marl / DE | 02
06.02.1987
21.05.1987
ADMISSIBLE DSM Research B.V. NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL Opponent's representative Hoogstraten, Willem Cornelis R. DSM Patents & Trademarks Office Geleen Postbus 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1987/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.01.1987
07.05.1987
ADMISSIBLE Hüls Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung/PB 15 D-45764 Marl / DE | ||
02
06.02.1987
21.05.1987
ADMISSIBLE DSM Research B.V. NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL Opponent's representative Hoogstraten, Willem Cornelis Roeland OCTROOIBUREAU DSM Postbus 9 NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL | |||
Former [1987/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.01.1987
07.05.1987
ADMISSIBLE Hüls Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung/PB 15 D-45764 Marl / DE | 22.05.1987 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.11.1987 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.01.1988 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 07.07.1988 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 17.07.1989 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.09.1989 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.09.1989 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.09.1989 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 29.12.1989 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 14.03.1990 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.05.1986 | [1987/20] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB699016 (ICI LTD); | [A]FR1381970 (SOLVAY) |