EP0069590 - Fabrics for use in composite sheeting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.12.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILLIKEN INDUSTRIALS LIMITED Wellington Mill Wellington Street Bury Lancashire BL8 2AY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/02] | For all designated states MILLIKEN INDUSTRIALS LIMITED Wellington Mill Wellington Street Bury Lancashire BL8 2AY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berczi, Charles Nicholas 73 Alty's Lane Ormskirk Lancashire / GB | [1983/02] | Representative(s) | Bass, John Henton, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [1983/02] | Application number, filing date | 82303544.9 | 06.07.1982 | [1983/02] | Priority number, date | GB19810020767 | 06.07.1981 Original published format: GB 8120767 | [1983/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0069590 | Date: | 12.01.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0069590 | Date: | 31.08.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | D04B21/16, B41N9/02 | [1983/02] | CPC: |
B41N10/04 (EP);
D04B21/16 (EP);
B41N2210/04 (EP);
B41N2210/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/02] | Title | German: | Stoff zur Verwendung in mehrlagigen Tüchern | [1983/02] | English: | Fabrics for use in composite sheeting | [1983/02] | French: | Etoffe pour l'application dans des feuilles composées | [1983/02] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 03.11.1983 | Examination requested [1984/02] | 03.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.08.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/07] | 03.09.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1986/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1985 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2399496 ; | [X]FR2129229 ; | [A]US3255614 ; | [A]DE2300995 ; | [A]US3600259 ; | [A]DE2707001 ; | [A]LU59791 ; | [A]GB1568702 |