EP0071489 - A perpendicular magnetic recording and reproducing head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.1987 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.11.1987 [1987/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/06] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toda, Junzo Takakuwa Haitsu 203 1033, Shimoaso Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 215 / JP | 02 /
Hiyane, Masao 546, Futoo-cho Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 222 / JP | [1983/06] | Representative(s) | Fane, Christopher Robin King, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/06] | Fane, Christopher Robin King, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 82304048.0 | 30.07.1982 | [1983/06] | Priority number, date | JP19810118525 | 30.07.1981 Original published format: JP 11852581 | [1983/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0071489 | Date: | 09.02.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0071489 | Date: | 07.09.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0071489 | Date: | 20.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/127, G11B5/17, // G11B5/33 | [1986/47] | CPC: |
G11B5/1278 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/06] | G11B5/12, G11B5/20, // G11B5/30 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/06] | Title | German: | Magnetkopf für senkrechte Aufzeichnung oder Wiedergabe | [1983/06] | English: | A perpendicular magnetic recording and reproducing head | [1983/06] | French: | Tête magnétique pour enregistrement ou reproduction perpendiculaire | [1983/06] | Examination procedure | 29.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/20] | 02.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 11.09.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.02.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.08.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP5512522 ; | [A]JP5584015 ; | [A]JP5534301 ; | [A]JP5619513 ; | [X]EP0031216 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0012912 (IBM [US]); | [A]DE2658956 (IBM DEUTSCHLAND); | [A]DE2819208 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]DE1952402 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG); | [A]DE2104445 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO) | [Y] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 39, (P-4)[521] 28th March 1980, page 121 P 4 & JP - A - 55 12522 (FUJITSU K.K.) 29-01-1980, & JP5512522 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN | [Y] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 18, no. 1, June 1975, pages 19-22, Armonk, N.Y., USA | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 23, no. 11, April 1981, pages 5097-5098, Armonk, N.Y., USA | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 15, no. 2, July 1972, pages 516-517, Armonk, N.Y., USA | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 131, (P-27)[613], 13th September 1980, page 163 P 27 & JP - A - 55 84015 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI K.K.) 24-06-1980, & JP5584015 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 66, (P-11)[548], 17th May 1980, page 78 P 11 & JP - A - 55 34301 (FUJITSU K.K.) 10-03-1980, & JP5534301 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 69, (P-60)[741], 9th May 1981, & JP - A - 56 19513 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO K.K.) 24-02-1981, & JP5619513 A 00000000 | [AP] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 24, no. 4, September 1981, pages 1931-1932, Armonk, N.Y., USA | [XP] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 24, no. 8, January 1982, pages 4034-4035, Armonk, N.Y., USA |