EP0072206 - Loudspeaker system for producing coherent sound [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.1987 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Strohbeen, John 160 Bergen Street Brooklyn, New York / US | [1983/51] |
Former [1983/07] | For all designated states OHM ACOUSTICS CORPORATION 241 Taaffe Place Brooklyn New York New York 11205 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/51] |
Former [1983/07] | 01 /
Strohbeen, John 160 Bergen Street Brooklyn New York / US | Representative(s) | Adams, William Gordon 36 Sydenham Road Croydon Surrey CR0 2EF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/14] | Adams, William Gordon 36 Sydenham Road Croydon Surrey CR0 2EF / GB | ||
Former [1983/07] | Adams, William Gordon 18 St. Omer Road Guildford Surrey GU1 2DB / GB | Application number, filing date | 82304136.3 | 05.08.1982 | [1983/07] | Priority number, date | US19810290956 | 07.08.1981 Original published format: US 290956 | [1983/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0072206 | Date: | 16.02.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0072206 | Date: | 23.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/26, H04R1/32, H04R7/26 | [1983/07] | CPC: |
H04R1/26 (EP,US);
H04R1/323 (EP,US);
H04R7/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL [1983/07] | Title | German: | Lautsprecheranordnung zur Erzeugung kohärenter Schallwellen | [1983/07] | English: | Loudspeaker system for producing coherent sound | [1983/07] | French: | Système haut-parleur pour produire du son cohérent | [1983/07] | Examination procedure | 25.07.1983 | Examination requested [1983/39] | 17.01.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.10.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.10.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 24.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.08.1986 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US3424873 (WALSH LINCOLN); | [A]DE2605936 (POEHLER SOUND HERBERT POEHLER); | [A]BE859408 (EVERS BERNARD); | [A]US4182429 (SENZAKI HIROSHI [JP]); | [A]DE2001379 (AKG AKUSTISCHE KINO GERAETE); | [A]FR2274194 (PENNA MARIUS [FR]) | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON AUDIO, vol. AU-12, no. 2, March/April 1964, pages 30-35, New York (USA); |