EP0072232 - Polyolefin surgical devices and method for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.1987 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHICON, INC. U.S. Route 22 Somerville, New Jersey 08876 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/07] | For all designated states ETHICON INC. U.S. Route 22 Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mellon, Darline A. 596 Country Club Road Bridgewater New Jersey / US | [1983/07] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/07] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 82304183.5 | 09.08.1982 | [1983/07] | Priority number, date | US19810291660 | 10.08.1981 Original published format: US 291660 | [1983/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0072232 | Date: | 16.02.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0072232 | Date: | 04.01.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0072232 | Date: | 30.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.11.1983 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/12, A61B17/08, B29C71/02 | [1986/31] | CPC: |
B29C71/02 (EP);
A61B17/122 (EP);
A61L31/048 (EP);
B29C71/0063 (EP);
B29C45/00 (EP);
B29K2023/12 (EP);
B29L2031/22 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L31/048, C08L23/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1983/07] | A61B17/12, A61B17/08, C08J7/08, B29C25/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1983/07] | Title | German: | Polyolefine chirurgische Vorrichtungen und Verfahren zur Herstellung derselben | [1983/07] | English: | Polyolefin surgical devices and method for producing the same | [1983/07] | French: | Dispositifs chirurgicaux polyoléfiniques et procédé pour leur fabrication | [1983/07] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 06.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/34] | 20.08.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.12.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 30.07.1986 | IT | 30.07.1986 | SE | 31.07.1986 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 30.07.1986 | |
SE | 31.07.1986 | ||
GB | 30.09.1986 | ||
Former [1989/28] | SE | 31.07.1986 | |
GB | 30.09.1986 | ||
Former [1989/16] | SE | 31.07.1986 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2054026 (ETHICON INC); | [Y]US4233022 (BRADY THOMAS E, et al); | [A]US3383375 (DER VEGT ANNE K VAN, et al); | [A]DE1229278 (SIEMENS AG) | [Y] - ENCYCLOPEDIA OF POLYMER SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, vol. 11, 1969, pages 608-609, Interscience, New York, USA |