EP0076566 - Gasborne stage positioner for two directions X and Y [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/15] | Gas bearing | ||
[1986/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.1987 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.1987 [1987/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONTROL DATA CORPORATION 8100-34th Avenue South Minneapolis Minnesota 55440 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/15] | For all designated states CONTROL DATA CORPORATION 8100-34th Avenue South Minneapolis Minnesota 55440 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tucker, Theodore Worth Winter Street Lincoln Massachusetts 01772 / US | [1983/15] | Representative(s) | Caro, William Egerton, et al J. MILLER & CO. Lincoln House 296-302 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [1983/15] | Application number, filing date | 82304332.8 | 17.08.1982 | [1983/15] | Priority number, date | US19810304228 | 21.09.1981 Original published format: US 304228 | [1983/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0076566 | Date: | 13.04.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0076566 | Date: | 07.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | F16C32/06, H01L21/68, H01J37/20 | [1983/15] | CPC: |
G03F7/70816 (EP,US);
B23Q1/38 (EP,US);
B23Q1/621 (EP,US);
G03F7/70716 (EP,US);
H01J37/20 (EP,US);
H05K13/0015 (EP,US);
F16C2300/62 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/15] | Title | German: | Gasgelagerter Arbeitstisch, der in zwei Richtungen X und Y verstellbar ist | [1986/19] | English: | Gasborne stage positioner for two directions X and Y | [1986/19] | French: | Table de travail portée par coussins d'air, mobile dans deux directions X et Y | [1986/19] |
Former [1983/15] | Gaslager | ||
Former [1983/15] | Gas bearing | ||
Former [1983/15] | Coussinet à couche de gaz | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 17.08.1983 | Examination requested [1983/43] | 31.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.11.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1220228 [ ] (RHEINSTAHL HENSCHEL AG); | US3803924 [ ] (SCHULIEN H, et al); | US4191385 [ ] (FOX WAYNE L [US]) | Examination | - Patent Abstracts of Japan, vol. 3, no. 35, 24 March 1979, page 129M53 | - Patent Abstracts of Japan, vol. 3, no. 107, 8. September 1979, page 133E136 |