EP0083146 - Vehicle with detachable ballast weight [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.1988 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.05.1988 [1988/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/27] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY 1 John Deere Road Moline, Illinois 61265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stuhrmann, Heinz Marstallstrasse 32 D-6830 Schwetzingen / DE | [1983/27] | Representative(s) | Pears, David Ashley, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [1983/27] | Application number, filing date | 82304373.2 | 19.08.1982 | [1983/27] | Priority number, date | EP19810110815 | 29.12.1981 Original published format: EP 81110815 | [1983/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0083146 | Date: | 06.07.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0083146 | Date: | 02.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0083146 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B62D49/08, B62D49/02, A01B59/06, E02F3/43 | [1987/20] | CPC: |
B62D49/085 (EP,US);
B62D49/0628 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/34] | B62D49/08, B62D49/02, A01B59/06, E02F3/86, E02F9/18 | ||
Former IPC [1983/27] | B62D49/08, B62D49/02, A01B59/06, E02F3/86 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1983/27] | Title | German: | Traktor mit abnehmbaren Ballastgewichten | [1983/27] | English: | Vehicle with detachable ballast weight | [1983/27] | French: | Tracteur avec masses de lestage amovibles | [1983/27] | Examination procedure | 19.10.1985 | Examination requested [1985/52] | 10.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.10.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2891681 (GREIVELL ROBERT L); | [X]DE2225891 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG); | [X]DE2228049 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG); | [A]FR2272949 (CATERPILLAR TRACTOR CO [US]) |