EP0073643 - Sputtering apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.05.1989 [1989/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 5-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/10] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 5-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Itaba, Takeshi No. 27-20 Nishishinagawa 1-Chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Nishiyama Akio No. 27-20 Nishishinagawa 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kikuchi, Noribumi No. 1-191 Kitabukuro-cho Ohmiya-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 04 /
Shingyoji, Takayuki 605-19 Mashitomi Kasukabe-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 05 /
Ohsawa, Yuzo No. 2-74-1 Kitabukuro-cho Ohmiya-shi Saitama-ken / JP | [1988/18] |
Former [1983/15] | 01 /
Itaba, Takeshi No. 27-20 Nishishinagawa 1-Chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Nishiyama Akio No. 27-20 Nishishinagawa 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Kikuchi, Noribumi No. 1-191 Kitabukuro-cho Ohmiya-shi Saitama-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Shingyoji, Takayuki 605-19 Mashitomi Ohmiya-shi Saitama-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Ohsawa, Yuzo No. 2-74-1 Kitabukuro-cho Ohmiya-shi Saitama-ken / JP | |||
Former [1983/10] | 01 /
Itaba, Takeshi No. 27-20 Nishishinagawa 1-Chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Nishiyama Akio No. 27-20 Nishishinagawa 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Kikuchi, Noribumi No. 1-191 Kitabukuro-cho Ohmiya-shi Saitama-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Shingyoji, Takayuki No. 2-171 Takahana-cho Ohmiya-shi Saitama-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Ohsawa, Yuzo No. 2-74-1 Kitabukuro-cho Ohmiya-shi Saitama-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Dealtry, Brian, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/10] | Dealtry, Brian, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 82304473.0 | 25.08.1982 | [1983/10] | Priority number, date | JP19810134502 | 27.08.1981 Original published format: JP 13450281 | [1983/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0073643 | Date: | 09.03.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0073643 | Date: | 04.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/34 | [1988/18] | CPC: |
H01J37/342 (EP,US);
C23C14/34 (KR);
C23C14/3407 (EP,US);
H01J37/34 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/10] | C23C15/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI [1983/10] | Title | German: | Zerstäubervorrichtung | [1983/10] | English: | Sputtering apparatus | [1983/10] | French: | Dispositif de pulvérisation | [1983/10] | Examination procedure | 24.02.1983 | Examination requested [1983/19] | 27.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.10.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | WO8100420 [ ] (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO [US]); | GB1509135 [ ] (BURROUGHS CORP); | US3855110 [ ] (QUINN D, et al); | US3897325 [ ] (AOSHIMA SHOICHI, et al); | US4090941 [ ] (WRIGHT ROBERT JOSEPH, et al); | US4126530 [ ] (THORNTON JOHN A); | US4151064 [ ] (KUEHNLE MANFRED R [US]); | US4236994 [ ] (DUGDALE RONALD A); | US4252626 [ ] (WRIGHT ROBERT J, et al); | DD146625 [ ] (REISSE GUENTER, et al); | DE1515309 [ ] |