EP0073674 - Pure 6,6-diiodopenicillanic acid and process for its preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.1986 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/10] | For all designated states PFIZER INC. 235 East 42nd Street New York, N.Y. 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sysko, Robert J. 6 Stone Cliffe Drive Niantic New London Connecticut / US | [1983/10] | Representative(s) | Moore, James William Pfizer Limited Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/10] | Moore, James William, Dr. Pfizer Limited Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 82304562.0 | 31.08.1982 | [1983/10] | Priority number, date | US19810298678 | 02.09.1981 Original published format: US 298678 | [1983/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0073674 | Date: | 09.03.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0073674 | Date: | 15.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C07D499/00 | [1983/10] | CPC: |
C07D499/00 (EP,US);
C07D499/04 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/10] | Title | German: | Reine 6,6-Diiodopenicillansäure und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1983/10] | English: | Pure 6,6-diiodopenicillanic acid and process for its preparation | [1983/10] | French: | Acide 6,6-diiodopénicillanique pur et procédé pour sa préparation | [1983/10] | Examination procedure | 04.09.1982 | Examination requested [1983/10] | 01.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.07.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.08.1986 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB2051046 (LEO PHARM PROD LTD) |