EP0102422 - Manufacture of reinforced medico-surgical tubes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/11] | Manufacture of reinforced medico-surgical tubes and resulting products | ||
[1987/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.07.1991 [1991/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sheridan, David S. Hook Road Argyle New York 12809 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/11] | For all designated states Sheridan, David S. Hook Road Argyle New York 12809 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/11] | Representative(s) | Day, Jeremy John, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London, WC1X 8PL / GB | [1984/11] | Application number, filing date | 82304573.7 | 31.08.1982 | [1984/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0102422 | Date: | 14.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0102422 | Date: | 29.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00, B29C47/00 | [1987/31] | CPC: |
A61M25/1036 (EP);
A61M16/04 (EP);
A61M16/0425 (EP);
A61M16/0434 (EP);
A61M16/0816 (EP);
A61M2207/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1984/11] | A61M25/00, B29D23/05, B29F3/10 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, SE [1984/11] | Title | German: | Herstellung von verstärkten medizinisch-chirurgischen Röhren | [1987/31] | English: | Manufacture of reinforced medico-surgical tubes | [1987/31] | French: | Fabrication de tubes médico-chirurgicaux renforcés | [1987/31] |
Former [1984/11] | Herstellung von verstärkten medizinisch-chirurgischen Röhren und sich daraus ergebende Produkte | ||
Former [1984/11] | Manufacture of reinforced medico-surgical tubes and resulting products | ||
Former [1984/11] | Fabrication de tubes médico-chirurgicaux renforcés et produits en résultant | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 15.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/35] | 21.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.12.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1048288 ; | [Y]US2810424 (SWARTSWELTER ERNEST E, et al); | [Y]FR1363321 ; | [A]DE2404656 (TECHNIBIOTICS); | [Y]DE2740063 (LEVEEN HARRY H); | [Y]US4210478 (SHONEY SURYAKANT R [US]); | [Y]DE3006058 (SURGIMED AS); | [Y]DE2837813 ; | [YP]EP0036674 (COPELY DEV LTD [GB], et al) |