EP0076049 - Recovery of precious metals from leach residues [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.1990 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATTHEY RUSTENBURG REFINERS (PROPRIETARY) LIMITED Winchester House 25 Loveday Street Johannesburg 2001 / ZA | [1983/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Day, Joseph George "Mardi" Penfold Lane Holmer Green Buckinghamshire / GB | 02 /
Taylor, Richard Jeffrey 150 Upper Woodcote Road Caversham Reading Berkshire / GB | [1983/14] | Representative(s) | Harrison, Ivor Stanley, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/46] | Harrison, Ivor Stanley, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | ||
Former [1988/39] | Harrison, Ivor Stanley Withers & Rogers 46 Tavistock Place Plymouth PL4 8AX / GB | ||
Former [1983/14] | Arthur, Bryan Edward Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 82304713.9 | 08.09.1982 | [1983/14] | Priority number, date | GB19810027977 | 16.09.1981 Original published format: GB 8127977 | [1983/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0076049 | Date: | 06.04.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0076049 | Date: | 31.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C22B11/02 | [1983/14] | CPC: |
C22B11/021 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Rückgewinnung von Edelmetallen aus Laugungsrückständen | [1983/14] | English: | Recovery of precious metals from leach residues | [1983/14] | French: | Procédé de récupération de métaux précieux à partir de résidus de lessivage | [1983/14] | Examination procedure | 03.06.1983 | Examination requested [1983/33] | 24.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.02.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.11.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 31.05.1989 | [2007/44] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 31.05.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | US1896807 [ ] (GEORG BAUER); | GB2049734 [ ] (RIO TINTO RHODESIA LTD); | GB2092618 [ ] (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC); | US4135923 [ ] (DAY JOSEPH G); | GB457902 [ ] (DEGUSSA); | GB2067599 [ ] (JOHNSON MATTHEY CO LTD); | GB316063 [ ] (ALAN RICHARD POWELL, et al); | US2109272 [ ] (LEONARD LARSON, et al) |