EP0074843 - Anode and connection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.1985 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HARCO CORPORATION 1055 West Smith Road Medina Ohio 44256 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/12] | For all designated states HARCO CORPORATION 1055 West Smith Road Medina Ohio 44256 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dimond, James R. 16570 Snow Road Burton Ohio 44065 / US | 02 /
Bushman, James B. 6395 Kennard Road Medina Ohio 44256 / US | [1983/12] | Representative(s) | Cook, Anthony John, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1983/12] | Application number, filing date | 82304823.6 | 13.09.1982 | [1983/12] | Priority number, date | US19810302855 | 16.09.1981 Original published format: US 302855 | [1983/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0074843 | Date: | 23.03.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/50 | [1983/12] | CPC: |
H01R4/5083 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/12] | Title | German: | Anode und deren Anschluss | [1983/12] | English: | Anode and connection | [1983/12] | French: | Anode et connexion pour celle-ci | [1983/12] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 13.09.1983 | Examination requested [1983/47] | 17.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/37] | 28.03.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1985/37] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.10.1984 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1091164 [ ]; | GB1514696 [ ]; | DE2436888 [ ] |